This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 02:17:50 (UTC).

The Vineyards vs Larry Nervis

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 The Vineyards filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Larry Nervis. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alva, Jose L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9598

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alva, Jose L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Vineyards

Defendant

Nervis, Larry

Others

All Occupants

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Echols, Paul E

Defendant Attorney

Tapia, Jose R.

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession returned Unserved as to Larry Nervis. Costs $125.00

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/18/2022 10:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Review of Declaration Re: COVID-19 held on 01/28/2022 10:30 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order to Prevent Forfeiture Due to Covid-19 Rental Deft GRANTED filed by Larry Nervis.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Review of Declaration Re: COVID-19 , set for 01/28/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department L2.

Order

Order to Prevent Forfeiture Due to Covid-19 Rental Deft GRANTED filed by Larry Nervis.

Notice

Notice of Limited Scope Represenation filed by Nervis, Larry.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Nervis, Larry.

Application

Application - Application to Prevent Forfeiture Due to Covid-19 Rental Debt filed by Nervis, Larry.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: L2; Result: Held; Judge: Carter Holly; Participants; All Other Occupants (Other); Larry Nervis (Defendant); The Vineyards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/18/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on February 18, 2022.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession returned Unserved as to Larry Nervis. Costs $125.00; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Review of Declaration Re: COVID-19; Court Room: L2; Result: Held; Judge: Carter Holly; Participants; Larry Nervis (Defendant); The Vineyards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial To confirm payment of rental assistance received and seal case, set for 02/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department L2.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Review of Declaration Re: COVID-19 held on January 28, 2022.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Review of Declaration Re: COVID-19 held on 01/28/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Warner, David P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Review of Declaration Re: COVID-19 , set for 01/28/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department L2.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Prevent Forfeiture Due to Covid-19 Rental Deft GRANTED filed by Larry Nervis.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Posting and Mailing Summons and Complaint pursuant to CCP 415.45 filed by The Vineyards.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by The Vineyards.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by The Vineyards.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Vineyards.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Paul E Echols, retained for The Vineyards .; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received by The Vineyards in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 688515.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Alva, Jose L.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Vineyards is a litigant