This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/23/2022 at 01:49:29 (UTC).

The People of The State of California vs Nine Thousand One Hundred Ten Dollars

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 The People of The State of California filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Nine Thousand One Hundred Ten Dollars. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0016

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The People of The State of California

Claimant

Villa, Uriel Martinez

Respondent

Nine Thousand One Hundred Ten Dollars

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hicks, Kevin A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villa, Uriel Martinez.

MC200 Claim Opposing Forfeiture

Claim opposing forfeiture of seized property, if value of property is over $5,000 filed by Villa, Uriel Martinez.

INT-300 Request for Interpreter

Request for Interpreter (Civil) filed by Villa, Uriel Martinez.

Subsequent Petition

Subsequent Petition for Forfeiture filed by The People of The State of California.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (CCP 1013.a) filed by The People of The State of California.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The People of The State of California.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service Mail (CCP 1013.a) filed by The People of The State of California.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/02/2022 08:45 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/09/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Nine Thousand One Hundred Ten Dollars (Respondent); The People of The State of California (Petitioner); Uriel Martinez Villa (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Nine Thousand One Hundred Ten Dollars (Respondent); The People of The State of California (Petitioner); Uriel Martinez Villa (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/09/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/02/2022 08:45 AM .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on February 2, 2022.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Mail (CCP 1013.a) filed by The People of The State of California.; Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by The People of The State of California.; Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (CCP 1013.a) filed by The People of The State of California.; Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubsequent Petition for Forfeiture filed by The People of The State of California.; Action Type: Subsequent Petition; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Kevin A. Hicks, retained for The People of The State of California .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter (Civil) filed by Villa, Uriel Martinez.; Action Type: Request for Interpreter (Civil); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/02/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villa, Uriel Martinez.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim opposing forfeiture of seized property, if value of property is over $5,000 filed by Villa, Uriel Martinez.; Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture of seized property, if value of property is over $5,000; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Uriel Villa in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 691612.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hicks, Kevin A.