This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:23:51 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs Maria Antionetta

Case Summary

On 09/30/2016 The People of the State of California filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Maria Antionetta. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9891

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Petitioners

People of the State of California

The People of the State of California

Claimant

Villafan, Maria Antionetta

Respondents

One thousand niney-five

Forty-seven Thousand Eight Hundred Seventy-Nine Dollars and Eleven Cents in U.S. Currency ($47,879.11)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hicks, Kevin A.

Claimant Attorney

Martinez, Precilino

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/29/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MC200 Claim Opposing Forfeiture

Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less) filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Case Management Statement filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Petition

Petition for Forfeiture filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Petition - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Petition for Forfeiture filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

Answer filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta Action Type: Answer; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 12/29/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta; Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/17/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order for Consolidation of Petitions for Forfeiture entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation

Stipulation to Stay of Forfeiture Proceedings filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Order to Stay Forfeiture Proceedings filed by The People of the State of California. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Case status updated to All Proceedings Stayed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Stay Forfeiture Proceedings filed by The People of the State of California. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation to Stay of Forfeiture Proceedings filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UAF-2016-0010178 Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order for Consolidation of Petitions for Forfeiture entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/19/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/17/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 17, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Petition for Forfeiture filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Case Management Statement filed by People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/29/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Attorney, Precilino Martinez, retained for Maria Antionetta Villafan . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less) filed by Villafan, Maria Antionetta. Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hicks, Kevin A.