This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:30 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs JF & Sons et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 The People of the State of California filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JF Sons. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1901

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

JF & Sons

Franks, Joshua Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salazar, Tori V.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Final Judgment

Stipulation for Fianl Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment

Judgment for The People of the State of California against Joshua Robert Franks in the amount of . See judgment filed herein. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to JF & Sons. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to JF & Sons served on 03/15/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Joshua Robert Franks served on 03/15/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Joshua Robert Franks filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

02/24/2016: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to JF & Sons. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to JF & Sons ONLY filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for The People of the State of California against Joshua Robert Franks in the amount of . See judgment filed herein. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation for Fianl Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Joshua Robert Franks filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Franks, Joshua Robert. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Joshua Robert Franks served on 03/15/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to JF & Sons served on 03/15/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/22/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Tori V. Salazar, retained for The People of the State of California . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less