This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 13:50:57 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs Forty Six Thousand Six Hundred Fifty Dollars

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 The People of the State of California filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Forty Six Thousand Six Hundred Fifty Dollars. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1219

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The People of the State of California

Claimants

Nguyen, Henry

Nguyen, Kimberly

Respondent

Forty Six Thousand Six Hundred Fifty Dollars

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hicks, Kevin A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The People of the State of California.

Petition

Claim opposing forfeiture of seized property, if value of property is over $5,000 filed by The People of the State of California.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by The People of the State of California.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by The People of the State of California.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/14/2022 08:30 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 04/27/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/27/2022 08:30 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Status Hearing , set for 09/06/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Status Hearing; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Forty Six Thousand Six Hundred Fifty Dollars (Respondent); Henry Nguyen (Claimant); Kimberly Nguyen (Claimant); The People of the State of California (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Forty Six Thousand Six Hundred Fifty Dollars (Respondent); Henry Nguyen (Claimant); Kimberly Nguyen (Claimant); The People of the State of California (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Status Hearing , set for 09/06/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/27/2022 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on April 27, 2022.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Forty Six Thousand Six Hundred Fifty Dollars (Respondent); Henry Nguyen (Claimant); Kimberly Nguyen (Claimant); The People of the State of California (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 04/27/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/14/2022 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 14, 2022.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by The People of the State of California.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by The People of the State of California.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/14/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim opposing forfeiture of seized property, if value of property is over $5,000 filed by The People of the State of California.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The People of the State of California.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Kevin A. Hicks, retained for The People of the State of California .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hicks, Kevin A.