This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:13 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs Aaron Roth's Handyman & Construction et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 The People of the State of California filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Aaron Roth's Handyman Construction. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1898

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The People of that State of California

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Aaron Roth's Handyman & Construction

Roth, Aaron Duane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salazar, Tori V.

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The People of that State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Further Case Management Conference filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Aaron Roth's Handyman & Construction, Aaron Duane Roth Not Entered -NO DEFT. NAMED Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Further Case Management Conference filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/13/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Aaron Roth's Handyman & Construction served on 11/21/2016 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Aaron Roth's Handyman & Construction. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Aaron Duane Roth served on 11/21/2016 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The People of that State of California. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/17/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Entry of Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Default Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of D. Scott McDonald in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by The People of the State of California. - ENTERED Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Default Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for The People of the State of California against Aaron Roth's Handyman & Construction, Aaron Duane Roth in the amount of $11,500.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of D. Scott McDonald in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/23/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 22, 2016. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 12/12/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by The People of that State of California. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/22/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The People of that State of California. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by The People of that State of California. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Tori V. Salazar, retained for The People of that State of California . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less