This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:41:04 (UTC).

The People of the State of California et al. vs Juan Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 The People of the State of California filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Juan Gonzalez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1844

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

People of the State of California

The People of the State of California

Claimants

Gonzalez, Juan

Gonzalez, Juan Luis

Respondent

One Thousand One Hundred Sixty-Five and no cents

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hicks, Kevin A.

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order Striking Claim Opposing Forfeiture filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order

04/04/2017: Order

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause re: Terminating Sanctions filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Petition for Forfeiture

Petition for Forfeiture filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 10/19/2016 02:57 PM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear on 5/25/16 Case Management Conference, pursuant to CCP section 177.5, set for 06/22/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Claim Opposing Forfeiture

Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less) filed by Gonzalez, Juan. Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Order and Judgment dismissing action

Order and Judgment dismissing action signed by Judge Humphreys; Entry of Court Ordered Dismissal as to The People of the State of California, Juan Luis Gonzalez, One Thousand One Hundred Sixty-Five and no cents Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 03/08/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order to Show Cause

Civil Order to Show Cause filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/08/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order to Show Cause

10/19/2016: Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions as to Claimant, Juan Gonzales on 5-25-2016 Case Management Conference and 6-22-2016 at Court's Order to Show Cause pursuant to CCP section 177.5, set for 10/19/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Proof of Service

Proof of service of claim opposing forfeiture to DA's Office filed by Gonzalez, Juan. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Juan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by The People of the State of California. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order and Judgment dismissing action signed by Judge Humphreys; Entry of Court Ordered Dismissal as to The People of the State of California, Juan Luis Gonzalez, One Thousand One Hundred Sixty-Five and no cents Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on April 28, 2017. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 04/28/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 06/27/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions for Failure to Appear, set for 04/28/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Order to Show Cause filed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear as to Claimant, Juan Gonzalez on 5/25/16 Case Management Conference, pursuant to CCP section 177.5 scheduled on 06/22/2016 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Hearing Result: Failure to Appear Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear on 5/25/16 Case Management Conference, pursuant to CCP section 177.5, set for 06/22/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of claim opposing forfeiture to DA's Office filed by Gonzalez, Juan. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/25/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Juan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less) filed by Gonzalez, Juan. Action Type: Claim opposing forfeiture ($5,000 or less); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less