Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 23:23:37 (UTC).

The Bokides Family Limited Partnership vs Stars Holding Co., LLC.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 The Bokides Family Limited Partnership filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Stars Holding Co , LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1728

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Bokides Family Limited Partnership

5River Fuels, Inc., a California Corporation, assignee of The Bokides Family Limited Partnership

Defendant

Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Bryant, Eurik

Defendant Attorney

Barlev, Jacob M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc. filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order on Stars Holding Co., LLC's Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Complaint filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Complaint for Money Damages and Injunctive Relief filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/17/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS015 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company served on 02/14/2017 by . $0.00. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order on notice of related cases, CRC 3.300(h) and Clerk's certificate of mailing

Order on notice of related cases, CRC 3.300(h) signed by Judge Humphreys filed by The San Joaquin Superior Court. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Third Amended Complaint

Third Amended Complaint filed by 5River Fuels, Inc., a California Corporation, assignee of The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Second amended Complaint....filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Supplemental Complaint for Money Damages and Injunctive Relief filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 06/15/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

First Supplemental Complaint

First Supplemental Complaint for Money Damages and Injunctive Relief filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order

Order on Ex parte for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice

Notice of Ommision of Referenced Exhibits in Plaintiff's Complaint and Addendum Thereto filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc. filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc. filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc. filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc. filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Jacob M. Barlev in Support of Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc. filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Payment received by LLC, Stars Holding Co. in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 311819. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Demurrer Deft. Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint of 5River Fuels Inc., set for 08/28/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Third Amended Complaint filed by 5River Fuels, Inc., a California Corporation, assignee of The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Demurrer of Defendant Stars Holding Co. LLC to the Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiff The Bokides Family Limited Partnership filed by Stars Holding Co., LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Eurik O'Bryant's Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for Temporary restraining Order and Preliminary injunction and Permanent Injunction to Stay Foreclosure filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Ex Parte , set for 11/21/2016 at 1:15 PM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/17/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Attorney, Eurik O'Bryant, retained for The Bokides Family Limited Partnership . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Payment received by The Bokides Family Limited Partnership in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 120830. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hearst Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARLEV JACOB M.