This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 16:35:16 (UTC).

The Best Service Co., Inc. vs Alfredo Espino

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 The Best Service Co , Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alfredo Espino. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0365

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Best Service Co., Inc.

Defendant

Espino, Alfredo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stapleton, Christopher

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Best Service Co., Inc..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by The Best Service Co., Inc..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alfredo Espino served on 11/19/2022 by Personal Service. $89.50.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Alfredo Espino served on 11/19/2022 by Personal Service. $89.50.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Best Service Co., Inc..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by The Best Service Co., Inc..; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. The Best Service Co. in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 787082.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Christopher Stapleton, retained for The Best Service Co., Inc. .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stapleton, Christopher