This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 06:51:58 (UTC).

Terry Shortridge et al. vs Tracy Islamic Center et al.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Terry Shortridge filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Tracy Islamic Center. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5842

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shortridge, Terry

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Tracy Islamic Center

American Contractors Indemnity Company

King Mahdi Builders, Inc.

Platte River Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

American Contractors Indemnity Company

King Mahdi Builders, Inc.

Platte River Insurance Company

Mahdi, Adib K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillips, Frederick C

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Barringer, William Bart

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

09/24/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint for: Breach of Written Contract, Quantum Meruit, and Foreclosure of a Mechanics Lien filed by King Mahdi Builders, Inc.. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Answer

King Mahdo Builders inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by King Mahdi Builders, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Answer

American Contractors Indemnity Company and Platte River Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint filed by Platte River Insurance Company; American Contractors Indemnity Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS015 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil

Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS015 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt-Civil

Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

SUM110 Summons - Cross Complaint

Summons on Cross Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint for Breach of Contract filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Answer

Answer to Complaint------First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Tracy Islamic Center served on 08/07/2021 by Personal Service. $80.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shortridge, Terry. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Shortridge, Terry. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant); Participant: King Mahdi Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Platte River Insurance Company (Defendant); Participant: Terry Shortridge (Plaintiff); Participant: Tracy Islamic Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketKing Mahdo Builders inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by King Mahdi Builders, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint for: Breach of Written Contract, Quantum Meruit, and Foreclosure of a Mechanics Lien filed by King Mahdi Builders, Inc.. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmerican Contractors Indemnity Company and Platte River Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint filed by Platte River Insurance Company; American Contractors Indemnity Company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by American Contractors Indemnity Company in the amount of $1305.00. Receipt number 681191. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by American Contractors Indemnity Company in the amount of $1305.00. Receipt number 681191. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint for Breach of Contract filed by Tracy Islamic Center. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAttorney, William Bart Barringer, retained for Tracy Islamic Center . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Tracy Islamic Center served on 08/07/2021 by Personal Service. $80.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/30/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shortridge, Terry. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Shortridge, Terry. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Terry Shortridge in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 656659. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Frederick C Phillips, retained for Terry Shortridge . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barringer, William Bart