This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 08:37:34 (UTC).

Teresa Stocker vs Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Teresa Stocker filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7413

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stocker, Teresa

Defendant

Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brownstein, Josh

Defendant Attorneys

Evans-Bonzell, Lynn E.

Yoshimura, Frances H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice to Filing Party

02/22/2021: Notice to Filing Party

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/03/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/15/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC (Defendant); Participant: Teresa Stocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Held; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC (Defendant); Participant: Teresa Stocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Frances H Yoshimura, retained for Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/12/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on July 15, 2021. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 07/15/2021 08:45 AM . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Held; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC (Defendant); Participant: Teresa Stocker (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 07/15/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Oak Farm Vineyards, LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Teresa Stocker in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 595338. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Teresa Stocker in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 595338. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/03/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Stocker, Teresa. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Teresa Stocker in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 583937. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn E Evans-Bonzell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOSHIMURA, FRANCES H.