This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 19:16:12 (UTC).

Teresa Guiterrez Ramos vs. Juan Trujillo

Case Summary

On 12/02/2010 Teresa Guiterrez Ramos filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Juan Trujillo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************9880

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramos, Teresa Guiterrez

Defendants

Trujillo, Azucena

Trujillo, Juan

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/02/2010: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order

05/16/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/08/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

07/11/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Proof of Service

07/11/2011: Proof of Service

Minute Order

07/11/2011: Minute Order

SC134 Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination (Small Claims)

04/15/2011: SC134 Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination (Small Claims)

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

01/24/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

05/16/2011: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SC) heard 08/08/2011 09:30:00 AM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • DocketScheduling auto case clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SC) heard 07/11/2011 09:30:00 AM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketAddress for Juan Trujillo selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketAddress for Teresa Ramos selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Fee Waiver Application Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal 6000.00Costs, 75.00 - Fee Waiver scheduled for 01/24/2011 at 09:30:00 AM in T1 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Ramos, Teresa Guiterrez on 12/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Ramos, Teresa Guiterrez on 12/02/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less