This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:38:19 (UTC).

Teresa Gomez Onofre vs Samantha Dale Dodd

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Teresa Gomez Onofre filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Samantha Dale Dodd. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1815

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onofre, Teresa Gomez

Defendant

Dodd, Samantha Dale

 

Court Documents

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service as to Samantha Dale Dodd (Substituted service). Costs 0.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Onofre, Teresa Gomez. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/22/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 22, 2016. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/22/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Samantha Dale Dodd (Substituted service). Costs 0.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/22/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $2.50, receipt number 33783. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 33780. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Onofre, Teresa Gomez. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less