This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:36:13 (UTC).

TBF Financial I, LLC vs Riggleman, Charmaine, individually and doing business as Hard Nox Recovery

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 TBF Financial I, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Riggleman, Charmaine, individually and doing business as Hard Nox Recovery. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alva, Jose L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7104

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alva, Jose L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TBF Financial I, LLC

Defendant

Riggleman, Charmaine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Whiteford, Kevin P.

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Charmaine Riggleman served on 07/05/2018 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Declaration of Kevin P Whiteford supporting Plaintiff's request for default Judgment

Declaration of Kevin P Whiteford supporting Plaintiff's request for Default Judgment - filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Brief in support of Plaintiffs Request for entry of default Judgment

Brief in support of Plaintiff's request for entry of Default Judgment - filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Brief; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for TBF Financial I, LLC against Charmaine Riggleman in the amount of $20,736.43. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail Notice of Entry of Judgment - Civil filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received by LLC TBF Financial I in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 387754. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received by LLC TBF Financial I in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 387754. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received by LLC TBF Financial I in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 387754. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Notice of Entry of Judgment - Civil filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for TBF Financial I, LLC against Charmaine Riggleman in the amount of $20,736.43. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Default against Charmaine Riggleman Entered Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Charmaine Riggleman served on 07/05/2018 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by TBF Financial I, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Kevin P. Whiteford, retained for TBF Financial I, LLC . Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketPayment received by LLC TBF Financial I in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 303665. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TBF FINANCIAL I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITEFORD KEVIN P.