This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 22:47:58 (UTC).

Taryn Wesenhagen vs Kristopher Wesenhagen

Case Summary

On 07/19/2016 Taryn Wesenhagen filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kristopher Wesenhagen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4009

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wesenhagen, Taryn

Respondent

Wesenhagen, Kristopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ellis, Albert M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Wesenhagen, Kristopher. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Wesenhagen, Kristopher. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Wesenhagen, Kristopher. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketRFO-Request for Order (Initial) filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketCase associated with case: , STA-FL-LSWC-2016-0004002 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Wesenhagen, Taryn. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Albert M Ellis, retained for Taryn Wesenhagen . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Kristopher Wesenhagen filed. Served on 08/16/2016. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketPayment received by TARYN WESENHAGEN in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 81029. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by WESENHAGEN, TARYN. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Albert M