Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 17:26:33 (UTC).

Target National Bank vs. Rudy D Mendez

Case Summary

On 09/27/2010 Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rudy D Mendez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6348

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Target National Bank

Defendant

Mendez, Rudy D

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ Return filed. Judge: CONVERSION.

Writ Return

11/07/2015: Writ Return

Payment Receipt

03/10/2015: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/17/2014: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

12/18/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/04/2012: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

05/03/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

09/28/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

09/28/2010: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ Return filed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • The status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Target National Bank on 03/27/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 03/10/2015, transaction number 1474413 and receipt number 390514. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 964.62. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Postjudgment credits acknowledged in the amount of 2930.74. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 269.99. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Target National Bank on 02/23/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 06/17/2014, transaction number 1355632 and receipt number 359174. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/27/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Payment received for 137 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 205.00 on 09/28/2010, transaction number 614290 and receipt number 151711. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Address for Tara Muren selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Target National Bank on 09/27/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Target National Bank on 09/27/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • Complaint filed by Target National Bank on 09/27/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TARGET NATIONAL BANK is a litigant