Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 23:44:10 (UTC).

Target National Bank vs. Rebecca N Bergthold

Case Summary

On 10/19/2010 Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rebecca N Bergthold. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7572

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Target National Bank

Defendants

Muren, Tara

Bergthold, Rebecca N

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

12/09/2010: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

11/09/2010: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration of Non Service

11/01/2010: Declaration of Non Service

SUM100 Summons - Civil

10/19/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

PLD-C-001 Complaint

10/19/2010: PLD-C-001 Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

10/19/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

10/19/2010: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Association created between Muren, Tara and Target National Bank. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Status of Rebecca Bergthold updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Status of Target National Bank updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2010
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Target National Bank on 10/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Target National Bank on 10/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Complaint filed by Target National Bank on 10/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TARGET NATIONAL BANK is a litigant