This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 23:37:53 (UTC).

Target National Bank vs. Maria I Iturbride

Case Summary

On 12/15/2010 Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maria I Iturbride. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0701

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Target National Bank

Defendant

Iturbride, Maria I

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

04/26/2012: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Payment Receipt

04/26/2012: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

08/18/2011: Payment Receipt

Mc-30

05/12/2011: Mc-30

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

05/12/2011: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service of Summons

02/04/2011: Proof of Service of Summons

Payment Receipt

12/16/2010: Payment Receipt

SUM100 Summons - Civil

12/15/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

EJ130 Writ of Execution

08/18/2011: EJ130 Writ of Execution

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

08/17/2011: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

JUD100 Judgment

05/26/2011: JUD100 Judgment

Declaration

05/12/2011: Declaration

Waiver of Interest

05/12/2011: Waiver of Interest

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

05/12/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

12/16/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Declaration

12/15/2010: Declaration

Complaint

12/15/2010: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2012
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 2851.59. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment credits acknowledged in the amount of 0.00. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 255.97. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment costs acknowledged 60.00. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Target National Bank on 07/06/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 652.70. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment credits acknowledged in the amount of 2209.72. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 254.80. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment costs acknowledged 72.00. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2010
  • Automatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Statement of Venue filed by Target National Bank on 12/15/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Target National Bank on 12/15/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Target National Bank on 12/15/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Complaint filed by Target National Bank on 12/15/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.