This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 10:05:52 (UTC).

Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni vs General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0739

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni

Defendant

General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zolonz, Adam M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 02/01/2023 by Personal Service. $163.75.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 02/01/2023 by Personal Service. $163.75.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/28/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 807570.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Adam M. Zolonz, retained for Tarak Rama Bhadra Tipirneni .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less