This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 01:04:29 (UTC).

Tanya Shupperd vs Alan Shupperd

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 Tanya Shupperd filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Alan Shupperd. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5532

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shupperd, Tanya

Respondent

Shupperd, Alan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thiessen, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Enforcement; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Alan Shupperd (Respondent); Tanya Shupperd (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Request for Order as to Alan Shupperd served on 01/10/2023 by Mailing.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Enforcement Petr's RFO atty fees, Motion to compel production of preliminary declaration of disclosures, set for 02/21/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketRFO-Request for Order (Modification) filed by Shupperd, Tanya.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Tanya Shupperd in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 802412.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketRequest for Preparation of Preliminary Declaration of disclosure and Schedule of Assets and Debts filed by Shupperd, Tanya.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Shupperd, Tanya.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Alan Shupperd filed. Served on 10/27/2022. Method of Service: Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Shupperd, Tanya.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Alan Shupperd.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Lisa Thiessen, retained for Tanya Shupperd .; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Shupperd, Tanya.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Shupperd, Tanya.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less