This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 23:55:09 (UTC).

Tamara King vs Patrick King

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 Tamara King filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Patrick King. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4324

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

King, Tamara

Respondent

King, Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Butler, Dianne Drew

Respondent Attorney

Stroup, Valerie Christine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by King, Patrick. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Earnings Assignment Order for Spousal or Partner Support entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Corrected Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Corrected Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2016
  • Payment received by Tamara King in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 97124. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Request for Preparation of Preliminary Declaration of disclosure and Schedule of Assets and Debts filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Request for Preparation of Preliminary Declaration of disclosure and Schedule of Assets and Debts; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Patrick King filed. Served on 08/17/2016. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Payment received by Tamara King in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 86060. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Attorney, Dianne Drew Butler, retained for Tamara King . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by King, Tamara. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stroup, Valerie Christine