This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 09:27:40 (UTC).

Tabular Glover vs Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Tabular Glover filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4034

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glover, Tabular

Defendants

Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.

Hoyer, Nicholas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scardigli, Nicholas John

Defendant Attorneys

Echavarria, Camilo

Varjian, Tina D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Glover, Tabular. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Glover, Tabular. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Joinder

Defendant Nicholas Hoyer's Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Hoyer, Nicholas. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Exhibit List

Compendium of Declarations and Supporting Exhibits in Support of Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Exhibit List; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Lindsay Samuel in Support of Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Motion

Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Change of Address

Defendant Nicholas Hoyer's Notice of Change of Address filed by Hoyer, Nicholas. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS030 Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Glover, Tabular. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Hoyer, Nicholas. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Nicholas Hoyer served on 05/18/2021 by Personal Service. . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (GA)

Order on Declaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (GA)

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/02/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

#170.6

Order on Declaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. served on 05/07/2021 by Personal Service. $28.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

#170.6

Plaintiff's CCP 170.6 Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Kronlund filed by Plaintiff Tabular Glover. Action Type: Peremptory Challenge pursuant to CCP 170.6; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Nicholas Hoyer (Defendant); Participant: Tabular Glover (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Reassigned; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Nicholas Hoyer (Defendant); Participant: Tabular Glover (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Nicholas Hoyer (Defendant); Participant: Tabular Glover (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: 10A; Result: Rescheduled; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Nicholas Hoyer's Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Hoyer, Nicholas. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Nicholas Hoyer in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 677407. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Rescheduled Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompendium of Declarations and Supporting Exhibits in Support of Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Exhibit List; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Duncan Schloss in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action, or Alternatively, to Stay Action filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. served on 05/07/2021 by Personal Service. $28.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's CCP 170.6 Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Kronlund filed by Plaintiff Tabular Glover. Action Type: Peremptory Challenge pursuant to CCP 170.6; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/02/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Glover, Tabular. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Glover, Tabular. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Tabular Glover in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 643185. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Nicholas John Scardigli, retained for Tabular Glover . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.