This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 03:42:30 (UTC).

T. A. Ross - Collections, A Corporation vs. Michelle Olney

Case Summary

On 05/20/2009 T A Ross - Collections, A Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michelle Olney. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9169

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T. A. Ross - Collections, A Corporation

Defendant

Olney, Michelle

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

05/21/2009: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

05/21/2009: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

05/22/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Judgment

07/23/2009: Judgment

Archival Judgement Public Civil

01/01/1900: Archival Judgement Public Civil

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

01/01/1900: Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2009
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2009
  • DocketMilestone of Case Management Conference Set - 115 met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2009
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DocketScheduling auto case clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2009
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 12 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketStatus of Michelle Olney updated to Defaulted. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit (1 to 10 only ENTERED) associated on 07/22/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 05/21/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketPayment received for 01 - Complaint or other 1st paper by assignee in the amount of 176.00 on 05/21/2009, transaction number 327266 and receipt number 65275. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 10/19/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in T2 at Tracy Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (For Reduction in Fees: Per BP code 6322.1) filed by T. A. Ross - Collections, A Corporation on 05/20/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by T. A. Ross - Collections, A Corporation on 05/20/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • DocketComplaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit (For Reduction in Fees: Per BP code 6322.1) filed by T. A. Ross - Collections, A Corporation on 05/20/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T.A. Ross - Collections, A Corporation is a litigant