This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/01/2022 at 02:05:23 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs Gabriel Godinez

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gabriel Godinez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8492

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

Godinez, Gabriel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aguirre, Nathalia A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Synchrony Bank.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Synchrony Bank.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Synchrony Bank.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Gabriel Godinez served on 10/19/2022 by Substituted Service. $89.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Gabriel Godinez served on 10/19/2022 by Substituted Service. $89.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue filed by Synchrony Bank.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Synchrony Bank.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Synchrony Bank.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Synchrony Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 773690.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Nathalia A. Aguirre, retained for Synchrony Bank .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aguirre, Nathalia Alissa