This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/05/2023 at 13:13:24 (UTC).

Susan P. Fuller vs Gregory Chatham

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Susan P Fuller filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Gregory Chatham. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9227

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fuller, Susan P.

Respondent

Chatham, Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Moore, Michael K.

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fuller, Susan P..

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Fuller, Susan P..

CH110 MP Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 10/10/2022.

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Susan P. Fuller.

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service

Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) returned Unserved as to Gregory Chatham. Costs $0.00

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/04/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

Ch-116 Request to Continue Hearing (No Fee) filed by Court

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC RE: Harassment held on 11/29/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 11/29/2022. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 12/16/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 12/16/2022. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 01/18/2023 10:30 AM .

CH200 MP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service filed by Fuller, Susan P..

CH130 MP Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 01/18/2023. See Order filed herein.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 01/18/2023. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 01/18/2023 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on January 18, 2023.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Fuller, Susan P..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 01/18/2023 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 12/16/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 12/16/2022. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/04/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) returned Unserved as to Gregory Chatham. Costs $0.00; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 11/04/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Susan P. Fuller.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 10/10/2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Michael K. Moore, retained for Susan P. Fuller .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Fuller, Susan P..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fuller, Susan P..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less