This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 01:02:47 (UTC).

Sum Hong Tao et al. vs Austin John et al.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 Sum Hong Tao filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Austin John. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0098

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

He, Fengqin

Tao, Sum Hong

Defendants

John, Austin

Salsedo, Katelyn

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Katelyn Salsedo served on 11/01/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 30.00. With attached Declaration of Diligence. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Fees of 30.00 woth date of service 11/01/15. Complies with ccp 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Austin John served on 11/01/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 30.00. Declaration of Diligence attached. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Entered as to all occupants. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by He, Fengqin; Tao, Sum Hong. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Sum Hong Tao, Fengqin He against Austin John, Katelyn Salsedo filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Katelyn Salsedo on 11/23/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Austin John on 11/23/2015 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 9501. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Sum Hong Tao, Fengqin He against Austin John, Katelyn Salsedo filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketRequest for Default against Austin John, Katelyn Salsedo Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by He, Fengqin; Tao, Sum Hong. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Entered as to all occupants. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service as to all occupants filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Fees of 30.00 woth date of service 11/01/15. Complies with ccp 415.46. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Austin John served on 11/01/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 30.00. Declaration of Diligence attached. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Katelyn Salsedo served on 11/01/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 30.00. With attached Declaration of Diligence. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 3350. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tao, Sum Hong; He, Fengqin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less