This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 07:57:28 (UTC).

Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy vs. Ajmer Singh

Case Summary

On 10/24/2011 Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Ajmer Singh. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4641

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy

Defendant

Singh, Ajmer

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

07/10/2014: Minute Order

Notice of Court's Order to Show Cause

04/21/2014: Notice of Court's Order to Show Cause

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

04/18/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Proof of Service

12/01/2011: Proof of Service

Order

11/04/2011: Order

Attorney's Declaration Requesting Posting of the Summons and Complaint

11/04/2011: Attorney's Declaration Requesting Posting of the Summons and Complaint

Payment Receipt

11/04/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice That You've Been Sued

10/25/2011: Notice That You've Been Sued

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

10/24/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2011: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

UD100 Complaint

10/24/2011: UD100 Complaint

Notice that you have been sued

10/24/2011: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

10/24/2011: Payment Receipt

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2014
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Status of Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Matter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Status of Ajmer Singh updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other (CLM) heard 07/10/2014 03:00:00 PM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • The Court orders the entire action dismissed without prejudice . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2011
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 10/24/2011, transaction number 883513 and receipt number 235763. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy on 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy on 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Complaint filed by Stuart Limited Partnership Tracy on 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less