Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 18:48:10 (UTC).

Stockton Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership vs Julie N. Hicks et al.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2016 Stockton Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Julie N Hicks. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8902

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership

Defendants

Hicks, Julie N.

Bloodsaw, Julian N.

Bloodsaw, Kevin J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wares, Dana

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Julie N. Hicks served on 11/02/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Julie N. Hicks, Kevin J. Bloodsaw, Julian N. Bloodsaw Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Julie N. Hicks served on 09/21/2016 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Julian N. Bloodsaw served on 09/20/2016 by Post & Mail. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership Stockton against Julie N. Hicks, Kevin J. Bloodsaw, Julian N. Bloodsaw in the amount of $4038.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration of Lost or Otherwise Unavailable Original Rental Agreement, Notice and Proof of Service of Notice filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership Stockton against Julie N. Hicks, Kevin J. Bloodsaw, Julian N. Bloodsaw filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kevin J. Bloodsaw served on 09/20/2016 by Post & Mail. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Attorney's Declaration Requesting for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership Stockton against Julie N. Hicks, Kevin J. Bloodsaw, Julian N. Bloodsaw in the amount of $4038.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Lost or Otherwise Unavailable Original Rental Agreement, Notice and Proof of Service of Notice filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Julie N. Hicks served on 11/02/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Writ of Possession as to Kevin J. Bloodsaw served on 11/02/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Writ of Possession as to Julian N. Bloodsaw served on 11/02/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Julie N. Hicks, Kevin J. Bloodsaw, and Julian N. Bloodsaw on 10/13/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2016
  • Declaration filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Payment received by Investors Stockton in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 101945. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney's Declaration Requesting for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Attorney, Dana Wares, retained for Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership Stockton . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Payment received by Investors Stockton in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 98598. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stockton, Investors Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARES, DANA