Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:04:14 (UTC).

STIP SPE I, LLC vs Elite Training Academy of California, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 STIP SPE I, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Elite Training Academy of California, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9661

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STIP SPE I, LLC

Defendants

Carr, James A

Elite Training Academy of California, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCusker, Brinton R

 

Court Documents

EJ100 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declartion in Support of Attorney's Fees filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to James A Carr served on 09/28/2016 by Substituted Service. $85.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against James A Carr Not Entered. Prematurely filed and incomplete. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Elite Training Academy of California, LLC Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS030 Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for STIP SPE I, LLC against Elite Training Academy of California, LLC, James A Carr in the amount of $47010.81. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to James A Carr and Elite Training Academy of California, LLC served on 11/10/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $725.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for STIP SPE I, LLC against Elite Training Academy of California, LLC, James A Carr filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against James A Carr Not Entered. Prematurely filed and incomplete. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Elite Training Academy of California, LLC served on 09/26/2016 by Personal Service. $85.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Payment received by LLC STIP SPE I in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 139535. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for STIP SPE I, LLC against Elite Training Academy of California, LLC, James A Carr in the amount of $47010.81. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declartion in Support of Attorney's Fees filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Elite Training Academy of California, LLC Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Elite Training Academy of California, LLC served on 09/26/2016 by Personal Service. $85.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Attorney, Brinton R McCusker, retained for STIP SPE I, LLC . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by STIP SPE I, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Payment received by SPE STIP in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 104610. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McCusker, Brinton R