Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 11:38:13 (UTC).

Steven Harrell vs Big Lots Stores, Inc., a corporation

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 Steven Harrell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Big Lots Stores, Inc , a corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0490

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harrell, Steven

Defendant

Big Lots Stores, Inc., a corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Razi, Omid

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 09/26/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Steven Harrell, Big Lots Stores, Inc., a corporation Entered. with prejudice Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/26/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions as to Attorney Omid Razi, set for 09/26/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/28/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/28/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/21/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Big Lots Stores, Inc., a corporation served on 05/09/2017 by Personal Service. $113.85. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Harrell, Steven. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harrell, Steven. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Sanctions held on 09/26/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped - see minute order. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Harrell, Steven. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Steven Harrell, Big Lots Stores, Inc., a corporation Entered. with prejudice Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/28/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions as to Attorney Omid Razi, set for 09/26/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/26/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 28, 2017. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • Case Management Conference scheduled on 07/21/2017 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Big Lots Stores, Inc., a corporation served on 05/09/2017 by Personal Service. $113.85. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/21/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Attorney, Omid Razi, retained for Steven Harrell . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Harrell, Steven. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Payment received by Steven Harrell in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 135125. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harrell, Steven. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAZI, OMID