This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/14/2023 at 01:52:14 (UTC).

Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007 vs Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP, a California limited partnership et al.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP, a California limited partnership. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8945

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007

Defendants

Bradford P. McCarthy, Personal Representative of the Estate of Luke V. McCarthy, deceased

Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company

GT Madison Realty, LLC,a Delaware limited liability company

GTM US Senior Housing Reit, Inc, a Delaware Corporation

GTM US Senior Housing Reit, LP, a Delaware limited partnership

Langendoen, Gary

Madison Realty Equities, LLC, a general partner of Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP

Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP, a California limited partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bossuat, Jamie Marie

Defendant Attorneys

Chandler, Paul W.

Chan, Camilla Y.

 

Court Documents

Ruling on Submitted Matter

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 02/10/2023 12:00 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

02/10/2023: Minute_Order.rtf

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 02/03/2023 09:00 AM .

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Defendant CLC's Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/24/2023 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 12/14/2022 09:00 AM .

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Defendant CLC's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Paul J. Borges in Support of Plaintifs' Opposition to Demurrer of Defendant Care Living Centers, LLC to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007.

amended Notice of Demurrer

Amended Notice re: Demurrer of Defendant Care Living Centers, LLC, to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint

Answer

Care living Centers, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company.

Signed Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 05/26/2023 09:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

05/26/2023: Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Minute_Order.rtf

05/26/2023: Minute_Order.rtf

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Defendant CLC's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/23/2023 08:30 AM .

Reply Brief

Reply Brief To Plaintiffs' Opposition To Demurrer Of Defendant Care Living Centers, LLC To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Paul J. Borges in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer of Defendant Care Living Centers, LLC to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007.

Opposition

Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer of Defendant Care Living Centers, LLC to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007.

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCare living Centers, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $8.50, receipt number 839394.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Demurrer; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Care Living Centers, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Demurrer held on 05/26/2023 09:00 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Demurrer held on May 26, 2023.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling published. Defendant CLC's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/24/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/23/2023 08:30 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to GT Madison Realty, LLC,a Delaware limited liability company served on 10/28/2021 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Villa Marche Stockton Acquisitions, LP, a California limited partnership served on 10/28/2021 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jamie Marie Bossuat, retained for Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007 .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea, Co-Trustees of the Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea Family Trust Dated October 30, 2007.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Co-Trustees Steven Gianandrea and Judy Baker Gianandrea in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 681859.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/21/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less