This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 23:36:31 (UTC).

Steve Giannecchini vs. Gary L Gardino

Case Summary

On 12/16/2010 Steve Giannecchini filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gary L Gardino. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0698

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Giannecchini, Steve

Defendant

Gardino, Gary L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

03/03/2011: Minute Order

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

01/10/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Envelope - Certified Mail Returmed

01/26/2011: Envelope - Certified Mail Returmed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

06/16/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

06/16/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

03/03/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Letter from HS Shergill, MD

06/13/2011: Letter from HS Shergill, MD

Minute Order

08/22/2011: Minute Order

Judgment on Small Claims Appeal

08/23/2011: Judgment on Small Claims Appeal

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketExhibits destroyed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketFee for 141I - Writ, transaction number 1366193 created on 02/06/2012 canceled due to Fees posted to wrong case. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketFee for 141B - Abstract of judgment - Small Claims, transaction number 1366183 created on 02/06/2012 canceled due to Fees posted to wrong case. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketCase status updated to Post Judgment effective 10/21/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 141B - Abstract of judgment - Small Claims, 141I - Writ in the amount of 50.00 on 09/30/2011, transaction number 871672 and receipt number 232750. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DocketPayment for 141B - Abstract of judgment - Small Claims, 141I - Writ, transaction number 871672 in the amount of 50.00 voided due to Applied to wrong case. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DocketAbstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 141B - Abstract of judgment - Small Claims in the amount of 25.00 on 09/29/2011, transaction number 871277 and receipt number 232653. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • DocketAbstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketStatus of Gary Gardino updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 05 - Claim >$5,000<=$7,500 in the amount of 75.00 on 12/16/2010, transaction number 682673 and receipt number 175971. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketAddress for Gary Gardino selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal 7500.00 plus costs scheduled for 01/26/2011 at 09:30:00 AM in B1 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department B1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Giannecchini, Steve on 12/16/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less