This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/29/2020 at 03:35:44 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Guneet Gill

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Guneet Gill. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2293

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant

Gill, Guneet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz II, Richard Louis

Defendant Attorney

Leonard, Bruce E

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gill, Guneet. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Answer

Answer to Complaint (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Gill, Guneet. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Guneet Gill served on 09/28/2019 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Gill, Guneet. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce E Leonard, retained for Guneet Gill . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Guneet Gill in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 490663. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Gill, Guneet. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Guneet Gill in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 490661. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Guneet Gill served on 09/28/2019 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/17/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 474297. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Richard Louis Mahfouz II, retained for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.