Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:14:18 (UTC).

Stacey Chen vs Denice Jones et al.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 Stacey Chen filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Denice Jones. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0940

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chen, Stacey

Defendants

Jones, Denice

Jones, Andre

Jones, Ashley

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Denice Jones served on 01/19/2017 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $225.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Stacey Chen against Denice Jones, Andre Jones, Ashley Jones filed and entered All Occupants Included. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Denice Jones served on 10/29/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ashley Jones served on 10/29/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Andre Jones served on 10/29/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Denice Jones, Andre Jones, Ashley Jones Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2016: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Denice Jones served on 01/19/2017 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $225.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Ashley Jones on 11/16/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Andre Jones on 11/16/2016 to . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Denice Jones on 11/16/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Stacey Chen against Denice Jones, Andre Jones, Ashley Jones filed and entered All Occupants Included. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Payment received by Stacey Chen in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 120349. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Denice Jones, Andre Jones, Ashley Jones Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Denice Jones served on 10/29/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ashley Jones served on 10/29/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Andre Jones served on 10/29/2016 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Chen, Stacey. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Payment received by Stacey Chen in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 115206. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less