This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:48:32 (UTC).

Springleaf Financial Services, Inc. vs Frank Chavis et al.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Springleaf Financial Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Frank Chavis. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1926

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.

Defendants

Chavis, Diane

Chavis, Frank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cramer, Todd L

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Execution as to Frank Chavis returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Springleaf Financial Services, Inc. against Frank Chavis, Diane Chavis in the amount of $3650.08. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration Re Use of Electronically Signed Note in Lieu of Original

Declaration Re use of Electronically Signed Note in Lieu of Original filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Diane Chavis served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration in Re CCP 1033

Declaration in RE CCP 1033 filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Frank Chavis served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $65.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution as to Frank Chavis returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Frank Chavis on 09/01/2016 to Los Angeles County. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Payment received by Todd L. Cramer in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 97653. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Re use of Electronically Signed Note in Lieu of Original filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in RE CCP 1033 filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Springleaf Financial Services, Inc. against Frank Chavis, Diane Chavis in the amount of $3650.08. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Diane Chavis served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Frank Chavis served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $65.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Todd L Cramer, retained for Springleaf Financial Services, Inc. . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34710. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less