This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 06:46:44 (UTC).

Spencer Bice vs Vensure HR, INC, a corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 Spencer Bice filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Vensure HR, INC, a corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1264

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bice, Spencer

Defendants

Vensure Employer Services, Inc

Vensure HR, INC, a corporation

VIM HR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kozina, Vladimir J.

Defendant Attorneys

Mason, Benjamin K.

Randolph, Jesse EM

Hicks, Nathan W

 

Court Documents

Supplemental Declaration

Supplemental Declaration of Vladimir J. Kozina in Support of Motion For Reconsideration filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Supplemental Declaration - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production and for Sanctions filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Motion for Reconsideration Needs to be heard by Judge Garrigan, set for 11/21/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 03/24/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Defendants Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action and Individual Complaint filed by VIM HR; Vensure Employer Services, Inc; Vensure HR, INC, a corporation. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/05/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Plaintiffs Demand For Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Vensure Employer Services, Inc; Vensure HR, INC, a corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion

Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Vladimir J. Kozina in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Amended Notice

Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration CCP 1008(a) filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Deem Matters Admitted and For Sanctions filed by Spencer Bice, Vensure HR, INC, a corporation, Vensure Employer Services, Inc, VIM HR. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Reply

Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motions to Deem Matters Admitted and for Sanctions filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC051 Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by VIM HR. Action Type: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/05/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response of Defendants Vensure HR, Inc. and Vensure Employer Services, Inc. to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Order Granting Same filed by Vensure Employer Services, Inc; Vensure HR, INC, a corporation. Action Type: Response; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion and Motion for Class Certification filed by Spencer Bice.(7/2/18 Conformed copy retn'd via courtesy mail. DGA) Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Vensure Employer Services, Inc; Vensure HR, INC, a corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Continuance of Case Management/scheduling of Trial Setting Conference filed by Vensure Employer Services, Inc; Vensure HR, INC, a corporation. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 06/22/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 07/27/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on June 22, 2018. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion held on 06/20/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Hearing re: Motion held on June 20, 2018. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/05/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 29612. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Bice, Spencer. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 29612. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Attorney, Vladimir J. Kozina, retained for Spencer Bice . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less