Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 23:07:00 (UTC).

Spanos Park East Owners' Association, vs Richard Dana et al.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 Spanos Park East Owners' Association filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Richard Dana. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1540

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Spanos Park East Owners' Association,

Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation

Defendants

Dana, Richard

Dana, Louise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stevens, Clifford W

Yaqoot, Sheba S.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation, Richard Dana, Louise Dana Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/19/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Richard Dana Not Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Richard Dana Not Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Summons returned Unserved as to Richard Dana. Costs $40.00 No Due Diligence. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association,. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association,. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation, Richard Dana, Louise Dana Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/19/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 07/20/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 19, 2017. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Richard Dana Not Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association, a California Non Profit Mutual Benefit Corporation. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons returned Unserved as to Richard Dana. Costs $40.00 No Due Diligence. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/19/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association,. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Spanos Park East Owners' Association,. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Payment received by Spanos Park East Owners' Association in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 119857. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Attorney, Clifford W Stevens, retained for Spanos Park East Owners' Association, . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stevens, Clifford W