This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 15:39:21 (UTC).

Sophia Sen vs Christine Micciche et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Sophia Sen filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Christine Micciche. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7945

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sen, Sophia

Defendants

Equity Management, Inc.

Golden Opportunity Investments, LP

Micciche, Christine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Partiyeli, Jacob O

Defendant Attorneys

O'Connor, Adam P

Aghakhani, Bryan

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Sen, Sophia.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sen, Sophia.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Declaration

Declaration of Bryan Aghakhani Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 430.041 RE Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sen, Sophia.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/22/2022 08:45 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/21/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Equity Management, Inc. served on 09/10/2021 by Personal Service. .

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP served on 10/08/2021 by Personal Service. $55.00.

Answer

Verified Answer of Defendants Christine Micciche, Equity Managment, Inc., and Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, to Complaint filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP; Micciche, Christine; Equity Management, Inc..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Micciche, Christine; Equity Management, Inc.; Golden Opportunity Investments, LP.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/21/2022 08:45 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Christine Micciche (Defendant); Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Sophia Sen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Held; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Christine Micciche (Defendant); Equity Management, Inc. (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Sophia Sen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/20/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on June 21, 2022.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/21/2022 08:45 AM .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Micciche, Christine; Equity Management, Inc.; Golden Opportunity Investments, LP.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Adam P O'Connor, retained for Golden Opportunity Investments, LP .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Adam P O'Connor, retained for Christine Micciche .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Adam P O'Connor, retained for Equity Management, Inc. .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Answer of Defendants Christine Micciche, Equity Managment, Inc., and Golden Opportunity Investments, LP, to Complaint filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP; Micciche, Christine; Equity Management, Inc..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Bryan Aghakhani Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 430.041 RE Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike filed by Golden Opportunity Investments, LP.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $19.50, receipt number 697419.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/22/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sen, Sophia.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Sen, Sophia.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Sophia Sen .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Sophia Sen in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 673725.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Golden Oppurtunity Investments LP is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT