This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/20/2023 at 16:00:20 (UTC).

Sophia Candelaria Hansell vs Robert House

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 Sophia Candelaria Hansell filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Robert House. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8326

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hansell, Sophia Candelaria

Respondent

House, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sodhi, Jakrun S

Respondent Attorney

Moore, Michael K.

 

Court Documents

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 12/02/2022. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 12/02/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Sophia Candelaria Hansell, Robert House.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/09/2022 10:00 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 10/04/2022. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 10/04/2022 10:30 AM .

Denied CH116 Order on Request to Continue Hearing

Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Sophia Candelaria Hansell.

CH250 Proof of Service of Response by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by House, Robert.

CH120 Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by House, Robert.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Esmeralda Zendejas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 05/16/2023. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on May 16, 2023.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 05/16/2023 10:00 AM .; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 05/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Esmeralda Zendejas in Department M2.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 04/18/2023 10:00 AM .; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Granted on 04/18/2023. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketOSC Re: Harassment scheduled on 04/18/2023 at 10:00 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Jakrun S Sodhi, retained for Sophia Candelaria Hansell .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing and to Reissue Temporary Restraining Order (Civil) filed by Hansell, Sophia Candelaria.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Robert House served on 09/23/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 10/04/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Sophia Candelaria Hansell.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 09/19/2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Hansell, Sophia Candelaria.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hansell, Sophia Candelaria.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less