This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:00 (UTC).

Sonja K. Earl et al. vs Sarah Ortez

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Sonja K Earl filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sarah Ortez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1883

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Earl, Sonja K.

Defendant

Ortez, Sarah

Assignee

George Sommers DBA Interstate Judgment Enforcement

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $991.09filed by George Sommers DBA Interstate Judgment Enforcement. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Earl, Sonja K.. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Judgment for Sonja K. Earl against Sarah Ortez in the amount of $5000.00. Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo held on 08/15/2016 09:30 AM . Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

notice of Trial de Novo

Hearing regarding: Trial De Novo , set for 08/15/2016 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

notice of appeal

Notice of Appeal (Small Claims) filed by Ortez, Sarah. Action Type: Notice of Appeal (Small Claims); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

04/06/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/22/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Earl, Sonja K.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service as to Sarah Ortez (Personal). Costs 0.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Sarah Ortez on 05/04/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Payment received by George Sommers DBA Interstate Judgment Enforcement in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 289985. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $991.09filed by George Sommers DBA Interstate Judgment Enforcement. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment filed by Earl, Sonja K.. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Hearing re: Trial De Novo held on August 15, 2016. Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo held on 08/15/2016 09:30 AM . Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Sonja K. Earl against Sarah Ortez in the amount of $5000.00. Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Trial De Novo , set for 08/15/2016 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Seth R. Hoyt Jr. in Department 21. Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Trial De Novo , set for 08/15/2016 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Richard M. Mallett in Department 24. Judge: Mallett, Richard M..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Payment received by Sarah Ortez in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 63085. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 22, 2016. Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/22/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: Garrigan, Michael N..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Sarah Ortez (Personal). Costs 0.00 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/22/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. principal 10.000.00 costs 75.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 34340. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Earl, Sonja K.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less