This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:27:08 (UTC).

Sokhom Kreus vs Yeth Sok

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Sokhom Kreus filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Yeth Sok. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0837

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kreus, Sokhom

Respondent

Sok, Yeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Hearing re: Default Dissolution held on July 1, 2016. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Default Dissolution held on 07/01/2016 08:15 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Default Dissolution Default Dissolution, set for 07/01/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department F1. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Kreus, Sokhom. Action Type: Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Request for Default against Yeth Sok Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Kreus, Sokhom. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Kreus, Sokhom. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Yeth Sok filed. Served on 03/05/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Sokhom Kreus filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Sokhom Kreus . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Kreus, Sokhom. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Kreus, Sokhom. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less