This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 10:05:44 (UTC).

Sikandar Malik vs General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 Sikandar Malik filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0738

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malik, Sikandar

Defendant

General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zolonz, Adam M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Malik, Sikandar.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Malik, Sikandar.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 02/01/2023 by Personal Service. $163.75.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Sikandar Malik (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 02/01/2023 by Personal Service. $163.75.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/28/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Malik, Sikandar.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Malik, Sikandar.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Sikandar Malik in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 807537.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Adam M. Zolonz, retained for Sikandar Malik .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less