This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:37:42 (UTC).

Sheryl Mendoza vs Joey Mendoza

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Sheryl Mendoza filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Joey Mendoza. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0886

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mendoza, Sheryl

Respondent

Mendoza, Joey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 248822. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Joey Mendoza filed. Served on 06/24/2016. Method of Service: Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Request for Default against Joey Mendoza Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial Statement Simplified filed by Mendoza, Sheryl. Action Type: Financial Statement Simplified; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Mendoza, Sheryl. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Mendoza, Sheryl. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Mendoza, Sheryl. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Additional Court Fees - Granted as to Sheryl Mendoza filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Sheryl Mendoza . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Mendoza, Sheryl. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Mendoza, Sheryl. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less