********************7758
08/24/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Commercial Eviction
San Joaquin, California
Rasmussen, Michael J.
Molles, Shelley
Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia
Costain, Kelly
All Occupants
Khan, Saveel
Demand for Jury Trial filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.
Answer filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.
Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike held on 12/20/2022 01:30 PM .
Plaintiff Shelley Molles' Opposition to Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike filed by Molles, Shelley.
Plaintiff Shelley Molles' Opposition to Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer filed by Molles, Shelley.
Hearing regarding: Demurrer , set for 12/20/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael J. Rasmussen in Department 3A.
Hearing regarding: Motion to Strike , set for 12/20/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael J. Rasmussen in Department 3A.
Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.
Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.
Judgment by Court entered and filed. -All Occupants are included.
04/26/2023: Notice to Filing Party
04/19/2023: Notice to Filing Party
Ex Parte Application and Order filed by Shelley Molles, Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia, Kelly Costain.
Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ; [Proposed] Order filed by Molles, Shelley.
Declaration of Plaintiff Shelley Molles' in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ filed by Molles, Shelley.
03/17/2023: Notice to Filing Party
Minutes finalized for Jury Trial held on 02/03/2023 09:30 AM .
Minutes finalized for Jury Trial held on 02/02/2023 09:00 AM .
DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketJudgment by Court entered and filed. -All Occupants are included.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketEx Parte Application and Order filed by Shelley Molles, Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia, Kelly Costain.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Plaintiff Shelley Molles' in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketEx Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ; [Proposed] Order filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketPayment received by Shelley Molles in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 822067.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia (Defendant); Kelly Costain (Defendant); Shelley Molles (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia (Defendant); Kelly Costain (Defendant); Shelley Molles (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessHearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia (Defendant); Kelly Costain (Defendant); Shelley Molles (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin
[-] Read LessDocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketPayment received by Shelley Molles in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 769021.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketAttorney, Saveel Khan, retained for Shelley Molles .; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketCase initiated.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.
[-] Read Less