This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 23:03:28 (UTC).

Shelley Molles vs Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Shelley Molles filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rasmussen, Michael J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************7758

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rasmussen, Michael J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Molles, Shelley

Defendants

Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia

Costain, Kelly

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khan, Saveel

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.

UD105 Answer

Answer filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike held on 12/20/2022 01:30 PM .

Opposition

Plaintiff Shelley Molles' Opposition to Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike filed by Molles, Shelley.

Opposition

Plaintiff Shelley Molles' Opposition to Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer filed by Molles, Shelley.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Demurrer , set for 12/20/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael J. Rasmussen in Department 3A.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Motion to Strike , set for 12/20/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael J. Rasmussen in Department 3A.

Demurrer

Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.

Motion to Strike

Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike filed by Costain, Kelly; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment by Court entered and filed. -All Occupants are included.

Notice to Filing Party

04/26/2023: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

04/19/2023: Notice to Filing Party

Ex Parte Application and Order

Ex Parte Application and Order filed by Shelley Molles, Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia, Kelly Costain.

Notice to Filing Party

Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ; [Proposed] Order filed by Molles, Shelley.

Declaration Re: Notice of Ex-Parte Application

Declaration of Plaintiff Shelley Molles' in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ filed by Molles, Shelley.

Notice to Filing Party

03/17/2023: Notice to Filing Party

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Jury Trial held on 02/03/2023 09:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Jury Trial held on 02/02/2023 09:00 AM .

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court entered and filed. -All Occupants are included.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application and Order filed by Shelley Molles, Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia, Kelly Costain.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Plaintiff Shelley Molles' in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Entry of Judgment and Issuance of Writ; [Proposed] Order filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Shelley Molles in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 822067.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia (Defendant); Kelly Costain (Defendant); Shelley Molles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia (Defendant); Kelly Costain (Defendant); Shelley Molles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia (Defendant); Kelly Costain (Defendant); Shelley Molles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Anthony Garcia aka Anthony W Garcia.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Shelley Molles in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 769021.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Saveel Khan, retained for Shelley Molles .; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Molles, Shelley.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less