This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 06:16:09 (UTC).

Shelby Rosewall vs Hyundai Motor America, a Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Shelby Rosewall filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America, a Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2275

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosewall, Shelby

Defendant

Hyundai Motor America, a Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Starr, Robert

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Hyundai Motor America, a Corporation served on 09/24/2019 by Personal Service. $15.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rosewall, Shelby. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rosewall, Shelby. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Hyundai Motor America, a Corporation served on 09/24/2019 by Personal Service. $15.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Attorney, Robert Starr, retained for Shelby Rosewall . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rosewall, Shelby. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rosewall, Shelby. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received by Shelby Rosewall in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474173. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.