This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 05:04:09 (UTC).

Sheila Freiberg vs Dennis Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q et al.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Sheila Freiberg filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Dennis Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6809

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freiberg, Sheila

Defendants

Brenda Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q

Dennis Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment by Court on Unlawful Detainer - After Trial Entered and Filed.

Judgment

Judgment for Sheila Freiberg against Dennis Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q, Brenda Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q in the amount of 2150.00 past due rent, 10033.80 hold over damages, 0.00 attorney fees and, 425.00 costs. Possession of the premises located at 825 E. Yosemite, Manteca, CA 95336. Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 12/19/2022 04:10 PM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/06/2022 10:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 11/23/2022 10:30 AM .

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

Request to Set/Counter Request to Set for Trial filed by Freiberg, Sheila.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against All Other Occupants Entered

Proof of Service as to All Occupants

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 08/26/2022. $55.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brenda Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q served on 08/26/2022 by Post & Mail. $55.00.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Dennis Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q and Brenda Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q on 01/06/2023 to San Joaquin County.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Landlords Eviction & Process Service LLC in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 801968.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court on Unlawful Detainer - After Trial Entered and Filed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 12/19/2022 04:10 PM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Sheila Freiberg against Dennis Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q, Brenda Pine, Individually and dba Billie Hill's Hillbillie Bar-B-Q in the amount of 2150.00 past due rent, 10033.80 hold over damages, 0.00 attorney fees and, 425.00 costs. Possession of the premises located at 825 E. Yosemite, Manteca, CA 95336. Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/06/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on December 6, 2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Freiberg, Sheila.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Landlord's Evictions & Process Service LLC in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 761069.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Sheila Freiberg .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Freiberg, Sheila.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Freiberg, Sheila.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Freiberg, Sheila.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less