This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 18:01:57 (UTC).

Shawn Charles Clark vs James Briscoe et al.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 Shawn Charles Clark filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against James Briscoe. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0567

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clark, Shawn Charles

Defendants

Briscoe, James

Ean Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beitmirza, Bretil

Defendant Attorney

Capabianco, Jennifer J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clark, Shawn Charles.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Clark, Shawn Charles.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ean Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company served on 02/07/2023 by Personal Service. $223.23.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to James Briscoe served on 02/07/2023 by Substituted Service. $176.22.

Answer

Defendant James Briscoe's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint for Damages filed by Briscoe, James.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Briscoe, James.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/30/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Ean Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); James Briscoe (Defendant); Shawn Charles Clark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Ean Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); James Briscoe (Defendant); Shawn Charles Clark (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/30/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketPayment received by James Briscoe in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 835112.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Jennifer J. Capabianco, retained for James Briscoe .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Briscoe, James.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant James Briscoe's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint for Damages filed by Briscoe, James.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received by James Briscoe in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 817991.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to James Briscoe served on 02/07/2023 by Substituted Service. $176.22.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ean Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company served on 02/07/2023 by Personal Service. $223.23.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/24/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Clark, Shawn Charles.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Clark, Shawn Charles.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Shawn Clark in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 806257.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Shawn Clark in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 806257.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Bretil Beitmirza, retained for Shawn Charles Clark .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less