This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 14:01:34 (UTC).

Shauntrell Vickers et al. vs Christina Micciche et al.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Shauntrell Vickers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Christina Micciche. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6858

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vickers, Shauntrell

Vickers, Shavon

Defendants

Equity Managment, Inc., an Entity

Golden Opportunity Investments, LP

Micciche, Christina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Partiyeli, Jacob O

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP served on 08/17/2022 by Substituted Service. .

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP served on 08/17/2022 by Substituted Service. .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/11/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/11/2023 08:45 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/19/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Christina Micciche (Defendant); Equity Managment, Inc., an Entity (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Shauntrell Vickers (Plaintiff); Shavon Vickers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Held; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Christina Micciche (Defendant); Equity Managment, Inc., an Entity (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Shauntrell Vickers (Plaintiff); Shavon Vickers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/19/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/11/2023 08:45 AM .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 11, 2023.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Christina Micciche (Defendant); Equity Managment, Inc., an Entity (Defendant); Golden Opportunity Investments, LP (Defendant); Shauntrell Vickers (Plaintiff); Shavon Vickers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/11/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP served on 08/17/2022 by Substituted Service. .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Golden Opportunity Investments, LP served on 08/17/2022 by Substituted Service. .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/07/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Vickers, Shauntrell; Vickers, Shavon.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Shauntrell Vickers in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 761360.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Jacob O Partiyeli, retained for Shauntrell Vickers .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less