This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:27:01 (UTC).

Sharon Sarahi Arriaga Rojo vs Esteban Junior Malpica

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Sharon Sarahi Arriaga Rojo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Esteban Junior Malpica. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0836

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Arriaga Rojo, Sharon Sarahi

Respondent

Malpica, Esteban Junior

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Request for Default against Esteban Junior Malpica Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Arriaga Rojo, Sharon Sarahi. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Arriaga Rojo, Sharon Sarahi. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Arriaga Rojo, Sharon Sarahi. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Esteban Junior Malpica filed. Served on 03/03/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Sharon Sarahi Arriaga Rojo filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Sharon Sarahi Arriaga Rojo . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Arriaga Rojo, Sharon Sarahi. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Arriaga Rojo, Sharon Sarahi. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less